US SB2933 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 537.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 537.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Colonel Charles Young Home Study Act - Directs the Secretary of the Interior to conduct a special resource study of the Colonel Charles Young Home, a National Historic Landmark in Xenia, Ohio, to determine the suitability and feasibility of designating the Home as a unit of the National Park System. (Colonel Charles Young was a distinguished African-American officer in the U.S. Army, a pioneer of techniques in military intelligence, as well as a commander of troops in combat in the Spanish-American War and the Mexican expedition against Pancho Villa.) Requires the Secretary to: (1) evaluate architectural and archaeological resources of the Home; (2) consider other alternatives for the preservation, protection, and interpretation of the Home, including the use of shared management agreements with the Dayton Aviation Heritage National Historical Park or specific units of such Park; (3) consult with the Ohio Historical Society, Central State University, Wilberforce University, and other interested parties; and (4) identify cost estimates for any federal acquisition, development, interpretation, operation, and maintenance associated with the alternatives considered. Requires the Secretary to report study results to Congress, as well as any conclusions and recommendations.
Title
Colonel Charles Young Home Study Act
Sponsors
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. George Voinovich [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-05 | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 537. | |
2010-08-05 | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Bingaman with an amendment. With written report No. 111-267. | |
2010-06-21 | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. | |
2010-03-17 | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 111-476. | |
2010-01-20 | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4514 (Same As) 2010-08-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.