US SB2873 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on September 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 641.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 641.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
National Park System Donor Acknowledgment Act of 2014 - Authorizes the Secretary of the Interior to authorize donor acknowledgments (a statement, logo, trademark, proper legal name, or other reasonable form of credit) at a a visitor center or administrative structure to recognize contributions for a museum collection or landscape feature at a unit of the National Park System. Requires such donor acknowledgments to be displayed in a manner approved by the Secretary and for a period determined by the Secretary to be commensurate with the amount of the contribution and the life of the structure. Allows such donor acknowledgments: (1) to be affixed to benches, furnishings, bricks, vehicles, walls, pathways, plazas, and staircases or, for those associated with land, water, vegetation, an item in a museum collection, or a historic structure, to be freestanding; and (2) to include acknowledgments on digital and media platforms. Repeals a provision prohibiting acknowledgments of donor contributions to commemorative works in the District of Columbia and its environs. Authorizes the Secretary or the Administrator of General Services (GSA) to acknowledge or permit a sponsor to acknowledge donor contributions at such a commemorative work if such acknowledgement: (1) is displayed inside an associated ancillary structure or as part of a landscape feature, (2) is freestanding, and (3) conforms to applicable National Park Service or GSA guidelines. Requires the sponsor to bear all expenses related to such display. Applies these provisions to any commemorative work dedicated after January 1, 2010.
Title
National Park System Donor Acknowledgment Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Coburn [R-OK] | Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 641. |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Landrieu with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 113-301. |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2014-09-18 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Subjects
Charitable contributions
Digital media
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Digital media
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations