US SB2499 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Health Savings Act of 2016 This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code, with respect to the taxation of health savings accounts (HSAs), to: rename high deductible health plans as HSA-qualified health plans; allow spouses who have both attained age 55 to make increased catch-up contributions to the same HSA; make Medicare Part A (hospital insurance benefits) beneficiaries eligible to participate in an HSA; allow individuals eligible for hospital care or medical services under a medical care program of the Indian Health Service or of a tribal organization to participate in an HSA; allow individuals eligible to receive medical benefits under certain TRICARE plans to participate in an HSA; allow members of a health care sharing ministry to participate in an HSA; allow individuals who receive primary care services in exchange for a fixed periodic fee or payment, or who receive health care benefits from an onsite medical clinic of an employer, to participate in an HSA; include amounts paid for prescriptions and over-the-counter medicines or drugs as "qualified medical expenses" for which distributions from an HSA or an Archer Medical Savings Account may be used; and allow HSA distributions to be used to purchase health insurance coverage. The bill amends the federal bankruptcy code to exempt HSAs from creditor claims in bankruptcy. The bill amends the Social Security Act to reauthorize the use of Medicaid health opportunity accounts. The bill allows a medical care tax deduction for: (1) exercise equipment, physical fitness programs, and membership at a fitness facility; (2) nutritional and dietary supplements; and (3) periodic fees paid to a primary care physician and amounts paid for pre-paid primary care services.
Title
Health Savings Act of 2016
Sponsors
Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] |
Sen. Mark Kirk [R-IL] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Jeff Flake [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-04 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4469 (Same As) 2016-02-24 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H865)
HB1752 (Related) 2015-04-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB2653 (Related) 2015-06-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3404 (Related) 2015-07-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4832 (Related) 2016-03-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB5452 (Related) 2016-06-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1752 (Related) 2015-04-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB2653 (Related) 2015-06-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3404 (Related) 2015-07-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4832 (Related) 2016-03-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB5452 (Related) 2016-06-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Bankruptcy
Employee benefits and pensions
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health personnel
Hospital care
Income tax deductions
Indian social and development programs
Inflation and prices
Medicaid
Medicare
Military medicine
Minority health
Nutrition and diet
Physical fitness and lifestyle
Prescription drugs
Religion
Sales and excise taxes
Sports and recreation facilities
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Tax treatment of families
Taxation
Employee benefits and pensions
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health personnel
Hospital care
Income tax deductions
Indian social and development programs
Inflation and prices
Medicaid
Medicare
Military medicine
Minority health
Nutrition and diet
Physical fitness and lifestyle
Prescription drugs
Religion
Sales and excise taxes
Sports and recreation facilities
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Tax treatment of families
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-bill/2499/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/s2499/BILLS-114s2499is.pdf |