US HB5452 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Native American Health Savings Improvement Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to specify that receiving hospital care or medical services under a medical care program of the Indian Health Service or a tribal organization does not disqualify an individual from being eligible for a health savings account.
Title
Native American Health Savings Improvement Act
Sponsors
Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI] | Rep. Erik Paulsen [R-MN] | Rep. Kristi Noem [R-SD] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2016-06-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-06-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4027) |
2016-06-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5452. |
2016-06-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4027-4028) |
2016-06-21 | House | Mr. Smith (NE) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2016-06-21 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 490. |
2016-06-21 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 114-631. |
2016-06-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2016-06-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-06-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2016-06-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2016-06-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2300 (Related) 2015-11-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
HB2653 (Related) 2015-06-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4469 (Related) 2016-02-24 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H865)
SB2499 (Related) 2016-02-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2519 (Related) 2016-02-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S740-741)
HB2653 (Related) 2015-06-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4469 (Related) 2016-02-24 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H865)
SB2499 (Related) 2016-02-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2519 (Related) 2016-02-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S740-741)
Subjects
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Hospital care
Income tax deductions
Indian social and development programs
Minority health
Taxation
Health care coverage and access
Hospital care
Income tax deductions
Indian social and development programs
Minority health
Taxation