US SB2234 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 46-27-1)
Status: Passed on December 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-14 - Became Public Law No: 114-269.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 46-27-1)
Status: Passed on December 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-14 - Became Public Law No: 114-269.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Office of Strategic Services Congressional Gold Medal Act (Sec. 3) This bill requires the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the President pro tempore of the Senate to arrange for the presentation of a Congressional Gold Medal to the members of the Office of Strategic Services in recognition of their service and contributions during World War II. After the medal is awarded, it must be given to the Smithsonian Institution.
Title
Office of Strategic Services Congressional Gold Medal Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-14 | House | Became Public Law No: 114-269. |
2016-12-14 | House | Signed by President. |
2016-12-07 | House | Presented to President. |
2016-11-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-11-30 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text of measure as passed: CR H7024-7025) |
2016-11-30 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2234. |
2016-11-30 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7024-7028) |
2016-11-30 | House | Mr. Huizenga (MI) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2016-02-24 | House | Referred to House Administration |
2016-02-24 | House | Referred to House Financial Services |
2016-02-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2016-02-23 | House | Held at the desk. |
2016-02-23 | House | Received in the House. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S914-915) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S914-915) |
2015-11-04 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3929 (Related) 2015-11-04 - Referred to House Administration
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional tributes
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Military history
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Smithsonian Institution
Congressional tributes
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Military history
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Smithsonian Institution