US SB2076 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: House Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: House Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
U.S. Merchant Marine Academy Board of Visitors Enhancement Act - Amends federal shipping law to: (1) expand the membership of the Board of Visitors to the U. S. Merchant Marine Academy, and (2) specify requirements for the presidential appointees. Authorizes certain Board members to designate another individual to serve as a substitute member of the Board, on a temporary basis, to attend or participate in any activity the Board member is unable to attend or participate in. Prescribes requirements for designated substitute Board members. Requires the Board to select biennially from among its members a member of the House of Representatives or a Senator to serve as Board Chairperson. Directs the Secretary of Transportation (DOT) to select a Designated Federal Officer to support the performance of the Board's functions. Directs the Board to report annually to the President on its actions, views, and recommendations with respect to the Academy.
Title
U.S. Merchant Marine Academy Board of Visitors Enhancement Act
Sponsors
Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2014-07-03 | House | Received in the House. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S4188-4189) |
2014-06-26 | Senate | S.AMDT.3442 Amendment SA 3442 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | S.AMDT.3442 Amendment SA 3442 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Boozman. (consideration: CR S4188; text: CR S4188)To strike the requirement that the Commander of the United States Transportation Command be a member of the Board of Visitors to the United States Merchant Marine Academy and that a substitute member of the Board be an officer of the United States Transportation Command. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S4188-4189) |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 375. |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Rockefeller without amendment. With written report No. 113-158. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4144 (Same As) 2014-06-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Seapower and Projection Forces.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Department of Transportation
Executive agency funding and structure
Higher education
Marine and inland water transportation
Military education and training
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Department of Transportation
Executive agency funding and structure
Higher education
Marine and inland water transportation
Military education and training
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees