US SB189 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2-1)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Became Public Law No: 117-45.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2-1)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Became Public Law No: 117-45.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to provide for annual cost-of-living adjustments to be made automatically by law each year in the rates of disability compensation for veterans with service-connected disabilities and the rates of dependency and indemnity compensation for survivors of certain service-connected disabled veterans, and for other purposes.
Title
Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. John Thune [R-SD] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] |
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-20 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 423 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-08 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 117-45. |
2021-10-08 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2021-09-27 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2021-09-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-09-20 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 423 - 0 (Roll no. 262). (text: CR H4536) |
2021-09-20 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4544) |
2021-09-20 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-09-20 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 189. |
2021-09-20 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4536-4537) |
2021-09-20 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-07-26 | House | Held at the desk. |
2021-07-26 | House | Received in the House. |
2021-07-26 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2021-07-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5023; text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S5023) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 84. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Tester with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. Without written report. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. (text: CR S319) |
Same As/Similar To
HB3909 (Same As) 2021-09-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
SB4223 (Related) 2022-07-13 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
HB7846 (Related) 2022-10-10 - Became Public Law No: 117-191.
HR1339 (Similar To) 2022-09-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB4223 (Related) 2022-07-13 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
HB7846 (Related) 2022-10-10 - Became Public Law No: 117-191.
HR1339 (Similar To) 2022-09-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.