US HB3909 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To increase, effective as of December 1, 2021, the rates of compensation for veterans with service-connected disabilities and the rates of dependency and indemnity compensation for the survivors of certain disabled veterans, and for other purposes.
Title
Veterans’ Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] | Rep. Troy Nehls [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2021-06-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-06-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB189 (Same As) 2021-10-08 - Became Public Law No: 117-45.
SB4223 (Related) 2022-07-13 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
HB7846 (Related) 2022-10-10 - Became Public Law No: 117-191.
HR1339 (Similar To) 2022-09-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB4223 (Related) 2022-07-13 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
HB7846 (Related) 2022-10-10 - Became Public Law No: 117-191.
HR1339 (Similar To) 2022-09-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/3909/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr3909/BILLS-117hr3909ih.pdf |