US SB4223 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-13 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-13 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to increase, effective as of December 1, 2022, the rates of compensation for veterans with service-connected disabilities and the rates of dependency and indemnity compensation for the survivors of certain disabled veterans, and for other purposes.
Title
Veterans’ Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2022
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] |
Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] |
Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-13 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3909 (Related) 2021-09-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
SB189 (Related) 2021-10-08 - Became Public Law No: 117-45.
HB7846 (Same As) 2022-10-10 - Became Public Law No: 117-191.
HR1339 (Similar To) 2022-09-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB189 (Related) 2021-10-08 - Became Public Law No: 117-45.
HB7846 (Same As) 2022-10-10 - Became Public Law No: 117-191.
HR1339 (Similar To) 2022-09-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/4223/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s4223/BILLS-117s4223is.pdf |