US SB1831 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-8-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-12 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-12 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
PACT Act Preventing Animal Cruelty and Torture Act Amends the federal criminal code to prohibit intentionally engaging in animal crushing in or affecting interstate or foreign commerce or within the special maritime and territorial jurisdiction of the United States. (Current law prohibits knowingly creating or distributing an animal crush video.) Adds exceptions for conduct that is for predator or pest control, medical or scientific research, or necessary to protect the life or property of a person from a serious threat caused by an animal.
Title
PACT Act Preventing Animal Cruelty and Torture Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-12 | House | Held at the desk. |
2016-12-12 | House | Received in the House. |
2016-12-12 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-12-10 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-12-10 | Senate | S.Amdt.5169 Amendment SA 5169 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-12-10 | Senate | S.Amdt.5169 Amendment SA 5169 proposed by Senator Boozman for Senator Toomey. (consideration: CR S7104; text: CR S7104) |
2016-12-10 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7104) |
2016-12-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2015-07-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2293 (Related) 2015-06-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Subjects
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Crime and law enforcement
Crimes against animals and natural resources
Crime and law enforcement
Crimes against animals and natural resources