US SB1827 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to establish an expansive infrastructure program to create local jobs and raise the quality of life in every community, to launch middle class career pathways in infrastructure, and to invest in high-quality American jobs, and for other purposes.
Title
Build Local, Hire Local Act
Sponsors
Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3473 (Same As) 2021-07-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
SB1629 (Related) 2021-05-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB3581 (Related) 2021-06-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
SB1629 (Related) 2021-05-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB3581 (Related) 2021-06-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/1827/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s1827/BILLS-117s1827is.pdf |