US SB1800 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Public Health Service Act to reauthorize and extend the Fetal Alcohol Spectrum Disorders Prevention and Services program, and for other purposes.
Title
FASD Respect Act Advancing FASD Research, Services and Prevention Act
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] |
Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] |
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Raphael Warnock [D-GA] |
Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3946 (Same As) 2023-06-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB2433 (Related) 2023-07-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3106 (Related) 2023-10-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3393 (Related) 2024-02-01 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 319.
SB2433 (Related) 2023-07-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3106 (Related) 2023-10-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3393 (Related) 2024-02-01 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 319.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/senate-bill/1800/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/s1800/BILLS-118s1800is.pdf |