US SB3393 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-01 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 319.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-01 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 319.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to reauthorize the SUPPORT for Patients and Communities Act, and for other purposes.
Title
SUPPORT for Patients and Communities Reauthorization Act
Sponsors
Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 319. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Sanders with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2023-12-12 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2023-12-04 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3550 (Related) 2023-12-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB3496 (Related) 2023-11-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB4079 (Related) 2023-06-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4098 (Related) 2023-06-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB1800 (Related) 2023-06-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2918 (Related) 2023-09-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3447 (Related) 2023-12-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB498 (Related) 2024-03-06 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1493 (Related) 2023-05-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2666 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2737 (Related) 2023-09-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2922 (Related) 2023-09-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3462 (Related) 2023-12-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3557 (Related) 2023-12-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB7164 (Related) 2024-01-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB7312 (Related) 2024-02-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB7899 (Related) 2024-04-09 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB3496 (Related) 2023-11-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB4079 (Related) 2023-06-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4098 (Related) 2023-06-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB1800 (Related) 2023-06-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2918 (Related) 2023-09-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3447 (Related) 2023-12-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB498 (Related) 2024-03-06 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1493 (Related) 2023-05-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2666 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2737 (Related) 2023-09-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2922 (Related) 2023-09-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3462 (Related) 2023-12-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3557 (Related) 2023-12-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB7164 (Related) 2024-01-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB7312 (Related) 2024-02-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB7899 (Related) 2024-04-09 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.