US SB1229 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on April 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-02 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-02 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to modify the procedures for issuing special recreation permits for certain public land units, and for other purposes.
Title
SOAR Act Simplifying Outdoor Access for Recreation Act
Sponsors
Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] |
Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] |
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-02 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3527 (Related) 2021-07-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
HB3670 (Related) 2022-12-14 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 460.
SB1874 (Related) 2021-12-02 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
HB3670 (Related) 2022-12-14 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 460.
SB1874 (Related) 2021-12-02 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/1229/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s1229/BILLS-117s1229is.pdf |