US HR609 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on September 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses support for the designation of Rail Safety Week.
Title
Expressing support to designate the week of September 22 through September 28, 2019, Rail Safety Week in the United States, and to support the goals and ideals of Rail Safety Week to reduce rail-related accidents, fatalities, and injuries.
Sponsors
Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] |
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] |
Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] |
Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials. |
2019-09-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2019-09-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR322 (Related) 2019-10-15 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 09/23/2019 CR S5631)
HR1106 (Same As) 2020-09-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
SR768 (Same As) 2020-11-12 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S6679; text: CR S6676-6677)
HR1106 (Same As) 2020-09-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
SR768 (Same As) 2020-11-12 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S6679; text: CR S6676-6677)
Subjects
Accidents
Commemorative events and holidays
Railroads
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security
Commemorative events and holidays
Railroads
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/609/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres609/BILLS-116hres609ih.pdf |