US SR768 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S6679; text: CR S6676-6677)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S6679; text: CR S6676-6677)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses support for the designation of Rail Safety Week.
Title
A resolution expressing support for the designation of the week of September 20 through September 26, 2020, as Rail Safety Week in the United States, and supporting the goals and ideals of Rail Safety Week to reduce rail-related accidents, fatalities, and injuries.
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-12 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S6679; text: CR S6676-6677) |
Same As/Similar To
HR1106 (Related) 2020-09-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
SR322 (Related) 2019-10-15 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 09/23/2019 CR S5631)
HR609 (Same As) 2019-09-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
SR322 (Related) 2019-10-15 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 09/23/2019 CR S5631)
HR609 (Same As) 2019-09-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Subjects
Accidents
Commemorative events and holidays
Railroads
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security
Commemorative events and holidays
Railroads
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/768/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres768/BILLS-116sres768ats.pdf |