US HR551 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses support for the mission and goals of 2014 National Crime Victims' Rights Week, which include increasing individual and public awareness of the impact of crime on victims, the challenges to achieving justice for victims, and the many solutions to meet such challenges. Recognizes: (1) that crime victims should be treated with dignity, fairness, and respect; and (2) the 30th anniversary of the enactment of the Victims of Crime Act of 1984.
Title
Supporting the mission and goals of 2014 National Crime Victims' Rights Week, which include increasing public awareness of the rights, needs, and concerns of, and services available to assist, victims of crime in the United States.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] | Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] |
Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2014-04-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SR424 (Related) 2014-04-11 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2407)
SR120 (Related) 2013-04-25 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3060; text as passed Senate: CR S3048)
SR120 (Related) 2013-04-25 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3060; text as passed Senate: CR S3048)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-resolution/551/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hres551/BILLS-113hres551ih.pdf |