US HR508 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses support for the designation of Naturopathic Medicine Week. Recognizes the value of naturopathic medicine in providing safe, effective, and affordable health care.
Title
Expressing support for designating October 6, 2014, through October 12, 2014, as "Naturopathic Medicine Week" to recognize the value of naturopathic medicine in providing safe, effective, and affordable health care.
Sponsors
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Sam Farr [D-CA] | Rep. Frank LoBiondo [R-NJ] |
Rep. Matt Salmon [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
HR211 (Same As) 2013-05-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SR135 (Related) 2013-05-09 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3343)
SR221 (Related) 2013-09-10 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6334-6335; text as passed Senate: CR S6333-6334)
SR420 (Related) 2014-09-18 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
SR135 (Related) 2013-05-09 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3343)
SR221 (Related) 2013-09-10 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6334-6335; text as passed Senate: CR S6333-6334)
SR420 (Related) 2014-09-18 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-resolution/508/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hres508/BILLS-113hres508ih.pdf |