US HR363 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution thanks and promotes the teaching profession by encouraging students, parents, school administrators, and public officials to participate in National Teacher Appreciation Week.
Title
Recognizing the roles and contributions of America's teachers to building and enhancing the Nation's civic, cultural, and economic well-being.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO] | Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] |
Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] | Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] |
Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS] | Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] |
Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
2019-05-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR197 (Related) 2019-05-08 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2748-2749; text: CR S2748)
HR959 (Related) 2020-05-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SR568 (Related) 2020-05-11 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2347; text: CR S2343)
HR959 (Related) 2020-05-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SR568 (Related) 2020-05-11 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2347; text: CR S2343)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Education
Elementary and secondary education
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Congressional tributes
Education
Elementary and secondary education
Teaching, teachers, curricula
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/363/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres363/BILLS-116hres363ih.pdf |