US HR1189 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting the designation of the week of April 29 through May 3, 2024, as "National Specialized Instructional Support Personnel Appreciation Week".
Title
Supporting the designation of the week of April 29 through May 3, 2024, as "National Specialized Instructional Support Personnel Appreciation Week".
Sponsors
Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Shontel Brown [D-OH] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
2024-05-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR331 (Same As) 2023-04-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SR181 (Related) 2023-05-04 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1539; text: 4/27/2023 CR S1423)
SR683 (Related) 2024-05-09 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3667; text: CR S3660-3661)
SR181 (Related) 2023-05-04 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1539; text: 4/27/2023 CR S1423)
SR683 (Related) 2024-05-09 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3667; text: CR S3660-3661)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-resolution/1189/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hres1189/BILLS-118hres1189ih.pdf |