US HR1094 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-3)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of May 5, 2022, as the "National Day of Awareness for Missing and Murdered Native Women and Girls".
Title
Expressing support for the designation of May 5, 2022, as the "National Day of Awareness for Missing and Murdered Native Women and Girls".
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] | Rep. Kelly Armstrong [R-ND] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] |
Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] |
Rep. Maria Salazar [R-FL] | Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD] | Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN] | Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] |
Rep. Matt Rosendale [R-MT] | Rep. Jay Obernolte [R-CA] | Rep. Cliff Bentz [R-OR] | Rep. Stephanie Bice [R-OK] |
Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] | Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2022-05-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR369 (Same As) 2021-05-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
SR196 (Related) 2021-04-29 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2368; text: CR S2368)
SR620 (Related) 2022-05-05 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2366; text: CR S2364-2365)
SR196 (Related) 2021-04-29 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2368; text: CR S2368)
SR620 (Related) 2022-05-05 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2366; text: CR S2364-2365)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/1094/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres1094/BILLS-117hres1094ih.pdf |