US HR369 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Introduced on May 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
Pending: House Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
Pending: House Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of May 5, 2021, as the "National Day of Awareness for Missing and Murdered Native Women and Girls".
Title
Expressing support for the designation of May 5, 2021, as the "National Day of Awareness for Missing and Murdered Native Women and Girls".
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. Kelly Armstrong [R-ND] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] |
Rep. Matt Rosendale [R-MT] | Rep. Yvette Herrell [R-NM] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Ashley Hinson [R-IA] |
Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD] | Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2021-05-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-05-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR196 (Related) 2021-04-29 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2368; text: CR S2368)
HR368 (Related) 2021-05-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
HR1094 (Same As) 2022-05-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
HR368 (Related) 2021-05-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
HR1094 (Same As) 2022-05-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/369/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres369/BILLS-117hres369ih.pdf |