US HR1081 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses support for the goals and ideals of National Teen Dating Violence Awareness and Prevention Week to raise awareness of teen dating violence in the United States.
Title
Supporting the goals and ideals of National Teen Dating Violence Awareness and Prevention Month.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Brady [D-PA] | Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. Alan Grayson [D-FL] | Rep. Patrick Kennedy [D-RI] |
Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] |
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] | Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-10 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-03-10 | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1232-1233) | |
2010-03-10 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 1081. | |
2010-03-10 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1232-1234) | |
2010-03-10 | Mr. Cohen moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. | |
2010-02-22 | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HR102 (Related) 2009-02-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
HR103 (Related) 2009-02-03 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SR373 (Related) 2010-01-25 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S203)
HR103 (Related) 2009-02-03 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SR373 (Related) 2010-01-25 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S203)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Crime prevention
Crimes against children
Crimes against women
Violent crime