US SR373 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-25 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S203)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-25 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S203)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates February 2010 as National Teen Dating Violence Awareness and Prevention Month. Supports communities to empower teens to develop healthier relationships. Calls for the observance of National Teen Dating Violence Awareness and Prevention Month with programs and activities that promote awareness and prevention of the crime of teen dating violence.
Title
A resolution designating the month of February 2010 as "National Teen Dating Violence Awareness and Prevention Month".
Sponsors
Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Thad Cochran [R-MS] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Joseph Lieberman [I-CT] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] |
Sen. David Vitter [R-LA] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-25 | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S203) | |
2010-01-25 | S.AMDT.3307 Amendment SA 3307 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. | |
2010-01-25 | S.AMDT.3307 Amendment SA 3307 proposed by Senator Specter for Senator Crapo. (consideration: CR S203; text: CR S203)To amend the preamble. | |
2010-01-25 | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S203) | |
2010-01-25 | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. | |
2009-12-09 | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S12818) |
Same As/Similar To
HR102 (Related) 2009-02-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
HR103 (Related) 2009-02-03 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1081 (Related) 2010-03-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR103 (Related) 2009-02-03 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1081 (Related) 2010-03-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Crimes against children
Crimes against women
Violent crime
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Crimes against children
Crimes against women
Violent crime