US HJR46 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 43-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-16 - Motion to Discharge Committee filed by Mr. Gosar. Petition No: 117-12. (Discharge petition text with signatures.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-16 - Motion to Discharge Committee filed by Mr. Gosar. Petition No: 117-12. (Discharge petition text with signatures.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to a national emergency declared by the President on March 13, 2020.
Title
Relating to a national emergency declared by the President on March 13, 2020.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | House | Motion to Discharge Committee filed by Mr. Gosar. Petition No: 117-12. (Discharge petition text with signatures.) |
2021-05-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2021-05-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2021-05-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HJR52 (Same As) 2021-06-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
SJR38 (Same As) 2022-03-03 - Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 48 - 47. Record Vote Number: 68. (text: CR S982)
SJR63 (Same As) 2022-11-16 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
SJR38 (Same As) 2022-03-03 - Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 48 - 47. Record Vote Number: 68. (text: CR S982)
SJR63 (Same As) 2022-11-16 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-joint-resolution/46/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hjres46/BILLS-117hjres46ih.pdf |