US SJR38 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 48 - 47. Record Vote Number: 68. (text: CR S982)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 48 - 47. Record Vote Number: 68. (text: CR S982)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A joint resolution relating to a national emergency declared by the President on March 13, 2020.
Title
A joint resolution relating to a national emergency declared by the President on March 13, 2020.
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Marshall [R-KS] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] |
Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Rand Paul [R-KY] | Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] |
Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Passed Senate without amendment (Y: 48 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 48 - 47. Record Vote Number: 68. (text: CR S982) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance discharged Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S965-982) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HJR46 (Same As) 2022-03-16 - Motion to Discharge Committee filed by Mr. Gosar. Petition No: 117-12. (Discharge petition text with signatures.)
HJR52 (Same As) 2021-06-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
SJR63 (Same As) 2022-11-16 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HJR52 (Same As) 2021-06-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
SJR63 (Same As) 2022-11-16 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.