US HJR1 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 90-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing a balanced budget amendment to the Constitution of the United States.
Title
Proposing a balanced budget amendment to the Constitution of the United States.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice. |
2015-01-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2015-01-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HJR2 (Related) 2015-01-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR7 (Related) 2015-01-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR12 (Same As) 2015-01-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR28 (Related) 2015-02-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR41 (Related) 2015-04-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR79 (Related) 2016-01-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR86 (Related) 2016-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR93 (Related) 2016-05-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR7 (Related) 2015-01-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR12 (Same As) 2015-01-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR28 (Related) 2015-02-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR41 (Related) 2015-04-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR79 (Related) 2016-01-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR86 (Related) 2016-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR93 (Related) 2016-05-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Subjects
Budget deficits and national debt
Constitution and constitutional amendments
Economic performance and conditions
Economics and public finance
Income tax rates
Legislative rules and procedure
Constitution and constitutional amendments
Economic performance and conditions
Economics and public finance
Income tax rates
Legislative rules and procedure
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-joint-resolution/1/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hjres1/BILLS-114hjres1ih.pdf |