US HJR2 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 109-2)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing a balanced budget amendment to the Constitution of the United States. This joint resolution proposes a constitutional amendment prohibiting total outlays for a fiscal year from exceeding total receipts for that fiscal year unless Congress authorizes the excess by a three-fifths roll call vote of each chamber. The prohibition excludes outlays for repayment of debt principal and receipts derived from borrowing. The amendment requires a three-fifths roll call vote of each chamber of Congress to increase the public debt limit. It requires a majority roll vote of each chamber to increase revenue. It also requires the President to submit a balanced budget to Congress annually. Congress is authorized to waive these requirements when a declaration of war is in effect or if the United States is engaged in a military conflict which causes an imminent and serious military threat to national security.
Title
Proposing a balanced budget amendment to the Constitution of the United States.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice. |
2015-01-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2015-01-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HJR1 (Related) 2015-01-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR7 (Related) 2015-01-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR12 (Related) 2015-01-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR28 (Related) 2015-02-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR69 (Related) 2015-11-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR79 (Related) 2016-01-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR86 (Related) 2016-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR93 (Related) 2016-05-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR7 (Related) 2015-01-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR12 (Related) 2015-01-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR28 (Related) 2015-02-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR69 (Related) 2015-11-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR79 (Related) 2016-01-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR86 (Related) 2016-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR93 (Related) 2016-05-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Subjects
Budget deficits and national debt
Constitution and constitutional amendments
Economics and public finance
Income tax rates
Legislative rules and procedure
Constitution and constitutional amendments
Economics and public finance
Income tax rates
Legislative rules and procedure
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-joint-resolution/2/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hjres2/BILLS-114hjres2ih.pdf |