US HB922 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-8)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-19 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-19 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit United States Government recognition of the Russian Federation's claim of sovereignty over Crimea, and for other purposes.
Title
Crimea Annexation Non-Recognition Act
Sponsors
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA] |
Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] |
Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. August Pfluger [R-TX] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] |
Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] |
Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Kathy Manning [D-NC] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. David Price [D-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2021-05-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-04-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Energy, the Environment and Cyber. |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2021-02-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6994 (Related) 2022-03-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
SB4937 (Related) 2022-09-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB9059 (Related) 2022-09-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Energy, the Environment and Cyber.
SB4937 (Related) 2022-09-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB9059 (Related) 2022-09-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Energy, the Environment and Cyber.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/922/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr922/BILLS-117hr922ih.pdf |