US HB9059 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Introduced on September 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Energy, the Environment and Cyber.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Europe, Energy, the Environment and Cyber Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Energy, the Environment and Cyber.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Europe, Energy, the Environment and Cyber Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit the United States Government from recognizing the Russian Federation's claim of sovereignty over any portion of the sovereign territory of Ukraine, and for other purposes.
Title
Non-Recognition of Russian Annexation of Ukrainian Territory Act
Sponsors
Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] |
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] | Rep. Shontel Brown [D-OH] | Rep. James Himes [D-CT] |
Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] |
Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Energy, the Environment and Cyber. |
2022-09-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2022-09-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB922 (Related) 2021-05-19 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
HB6994 (Related) 2022-03-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
SB4937 (Same As) 2022-09-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB6994 (Related) 2022-03-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
SB4937 (Same As) 2022-09-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/9059/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr9059/BILLS-117hr9059ih.pdf |