US SB4937 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-8-2)
Status: Introduced on September 22 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 22 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to prohibit the United States Government from recognizing the Russian Federation's claim of sovereignty over any portion of the sovereign territory of Ukraine, and for other purposes.
Title
Non-Recognition of Russian Annexation of Ukrainian Territory Act
Sponsors
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] |
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] |
Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] |
Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] |
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. John Hickenlooper [D-CO] |
Sen. Raphael Warnock [D-GA] | Sen. Alex Padilla [D-CA] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6994 (Related) 2022-03-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
HB922 (Related) 2021-05-19 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
HB9059 (Same As) 2022-09-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Energy, the Environment and Cyber.
HB922 (Related) 2021-05-19 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
HB9059 (Same As) 2022-09-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Energy, the Environment and Cyber.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/4937/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s4937/BILLS-117s4937is.pdf |