US HB900 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-06 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E250)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-06 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E250)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Cancel the Sequester Act of 2013 - Amends the Balanced Budget and Emergency Deficit Controlled Act of 1985 (Gramm-Rudman-Hollings Act), as amended by the Budget Control Act of 2011, to repeal certain sequestration requirements for enforcement of a specified budget goal.
Title
Cancel the Sequester Act of 2013
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-06 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E250) |
2013-02-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Budget. |
Same As/Similar To
SB18 (Related) 2013-02-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB505 (Related) 2013-04-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
HB505 (Related) 2013-04-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/900/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr900/BILLS-113hr900ih.pdf |