US HB847 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Directs the National Science Foundation to support merit-reviewed and competitively awarded research on privacy enhancing technologies. The Networking and Information Technology Research and Development Program (NITRD) must coordinate with appropriate agencies to accelerate the development, deployment, and adoption of privacy enhancing technologies. The bill also requires NITRD to submit to Congress a report on the progress of research on privacy enhancing technologies and the development of specified voluntary resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Promoting Digital Privacy Technologies Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-11 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 401 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-12SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
2022-05-11HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2022-05-11HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 401 - 19 (Roll no. 150). (text: 05/10/2022 CR H4728)
2022-05-11HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4831)
2022-05-10HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2022-05-10HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 847.
2022-05-10HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4728-4729)
2022-05-10HouseMs. Stevens moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2022-05-03HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 225.
2022-05-03HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 117-305.
2022-01-19HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2022-01-19HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2022-01-12HouseSubcommittee on Research and Technology Discharged.
2021-02-04HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
2021-02-04HouseReferred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
2021-02-04HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB224 (Same As) 2021-02-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB5807 (Related) 2021-11-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
SB3065 (Related) 2021-10-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback