US HB5807 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
Pending: House Consumer Protection and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
Pending: House Consumer Protection and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To establish national data privacy standards in the United States, and for other purposes.
Title
DATA Privacy Act Digital Accountability and Transparency to Advance Privacy Act
Sponsors
Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce. |
2021-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology. |
2021-11-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-11-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3065 (Related) 2021-10-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB847 (Related) 2022-05-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB224 (Related) 2021-02-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB847 (Related) 2022-05-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB224 (Related) 2021-02-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/5807/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr5807/BILLS-117hr5807ih.pdf |