US HB7966 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 81-0)
Status: Introduced on June 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for increased authorization of funding to secure schools, and for other purposes.
Title
STOP II Act Secure Every School and Protect Our Nation’s Children Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2022-06-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2022-06-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB750 (Related) 2021-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB111 (Related) 2021-07-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 102.
SB111 (Related) 2021-07-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 102.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/7966/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr7966/BILLS-117hr7966ih.pdf |