US HB750 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 28-3)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To establish the Federal Clearinghouse on School Safety Best Practices, and for other purposes.
Title
Luke and Alex School Safety Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] | Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] |
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] |
Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] | Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] | Rep. Maria Salazar [R-FL] | Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL] |
Rep. Nancy Mace [R-SC] | Rep. Kay Granger [R-TX] | Rep. Ernest Gonzales [R-TX] | Rep. Julia Letlow [R-LA] |
Rep. Michael Guest [R-MS] | Rep. Burgess Owens [R-UT] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] |
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Bryan Steil [R-WI] | Rep. Carlos Gimenez [R-FL] | Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] |
Rep. Steve Womack [R-AR] | Rep. Cliff Bentz [R-OR] | Rep. Nicole Malliotakis [R-NY] | Rep. Tracey Mann [R-KS] |
Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV] | Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] | Rep. Mike Garcia [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-02-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB111 (Same As) 2021-07-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 102.
HB7966 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB7966 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/750/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr750/BILLS-117hr750ih.pdf |