US HB7369 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to expand the eligibility of veterans who may receive self-employment assistance under the Veteran Readiness and Employment program of the Department of Veterans Affairs.
Title
VENTURE Act Veteran Eligibility for Necessities To Undertake Rewarding Entrepreneurship Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2022-04-06 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-04-06 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Discharged. |
2022-04-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2022-04-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2022-04-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB7939 (Related) 2023-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 117-333.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/7369/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr7369/BILLS-117hr7369ih.pdf |