US HB661 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 58-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-05 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 366.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-05 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 366.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement to take into custody certain aliens who have been charged in the United States with a crime that resulted in the death or serious bodily injury of another person, and for other purposes.
Title
Sarah's Law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 366. |
2024-04-05 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 118-442. |
2024-03-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 14 - 9. |
2024-03-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2023-01-31 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB160 (Same As) 2023-01-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB3599 (Related) 2024-12-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
HB3599 (Related) 2024-12-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.