US HB6376 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to extend eligibility for a certain work-study allowance paid by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to certain individuals who pursue programs of rehabilitation, education, or training on at least a half-time basis, and for other purposes.
Title
Student Veteran Work Study Modernization Act
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Kathy Manning [D-NC] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] |
Rep. Marie Newman [D-IL] | Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR] | Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] |
Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA] | Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] | Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] |
Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] |
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-17 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 370 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2022-05-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-05-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 370 - 43 (Roll no. 206). (text: 05/16/2022 CR H5000-5001) |
2022-05-17 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5085-5086) |
2022-05-16 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-05-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6376. |
2022-05-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5000-5001) |
2022-05-16 | House | Mr. Trone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2022-04-06 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2022-04-06 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-04-06 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Discharged. |
2022-04-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2022-01-12 | House | Introduced in House |