US HB6160 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on December 19 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-21 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 19 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-21 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 5, United States Code, to clarify the sources of the authority to issue regulations regarding certifications and other criteria applicable to legislative branch employees under Wounded Warriors Federal Leave Act. (Sec. 1) This bill modifies the self-certification requirements for federal employees who use disabled veteran leave. Currently, a federal employee who uses disabled veteran leave must certify that the leave was used to undergo medical treatment for a service-connected disability. The Office of Personnel Management is authorized to prescribe the form and manner of such certification. This bill adds a new provision to specify, in the case of a legislative branch employee, which office is authorized to prescribe the form and manner of the certification.
Title
To amend title 5, United States Code, to clarify the sources of the authority to issue regulations regarding certifications and other criteria applicable to legislative branch employees under Wounded Warriors Federal Leave Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Gregg Harper [R-MS] | Rep. Robert Brady [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-21 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7622) |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-06-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-06-28 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H5852) |
2018-06-28 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H5852-5853) |
2018-06-28 | House | Mr. Harper asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2018-06-28 | House | Committee on Oversight and Government discharged. |
2018-06-28 | House | Committee on House Administration discharged. |
2018-06-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-06-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-06-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3098 (Related) 2018-06-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.