US HB5128 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-08 - Became Public Law No: 111-176.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-08 - Became Public Law No: 111-176.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the United States Department of the Interior Building located at 1849 C Street, NW, in Washington, DC, as the "Stewart Lee Udall Department of the Interior Building."
Title
To designate the United States Department of the Interior Building in Washington, District of Columbia, as the "Stewart Lee Udall Department of the Interior Building".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-08 | Became Public Law No: 111-176. | |
2010-06-08 | Signed by President. | |
2010-05-28 | Presented to President. | |
2010-05-26 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | |
2010-05-25 | Cleared for White House. | |
2010-05-25 | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4394) | |
2010-05-24 | Received in the Senate, read twice. | |
2010-05-20 | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-05-20 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-05-20 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 409 - 1 (Roll no. 290). (text: CR 5/19/2010 H3609) | |
2010-05-20 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3681-3682) | |
2010-05-19 | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Teague objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn. | |
2010-05-19 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5128. | |
2010-05-19 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3609-3610) | |
2010-05-19 | Mr. Teague moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. | |
2010-05-18 | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 196. | |
2010-05-18 | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 111-485. | |
2010-04-29 | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. | |
2010-04-29 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2010-04-29 | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged. | |
2010-04-23 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. | |
2010-04-22 | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3248 (Same As) 2010-05-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 407.
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Department of the Interior
District of Columbia
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Department of the Interior
District of Columbia
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics