US HB5119 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 37-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
No 2H2O from Iran Act (Sec. 2) This bill prohibits funds available to any federal department or agency for any fiscal year from being obligated or expended to purchase or issue a license to purchase heavy water produced in Iran.
Title
No 2H2O from Iran Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Pompeo [R-KS] | Rep. Peter Roskam [R-IL] | Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] | Rep. Ron DeSantis [R-FL] |
Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] | Rep. French Hill [R-AR] | Rep. John Fleming [R-LA] |
Rep. Daniel Donovan [R-NY] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Christopher Gibson [R-NY] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] |
Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC] | Rep. Devin Nunes [R-CA] | Rep. John Ratcliffe [R-TX] | Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] |
Rep. Ryan Costello [R-PA] | Rep. Mick Mulvaney [R-SC] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] |
Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ] | Rep. Dennis Ross [R-FL] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] |
Rep. Jim Bridenstine [R-OK] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Dave Brat [R-VA] | Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] |
Rep. Jeb Hensarling [R-TX] | Rep. Gary Palmer [R-AL] | Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] | Rep. David Trott [R-MI] |
Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Rep. Charles Boustany [R-LA] | Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] |
Rep. Candice Miller [R-MI] |
Roll Calls
House - On Passage (Y: 249 N: 176 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - On Passage (Y: 249 N: 176 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - On Passage (Y: 249 N: 176 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2016-07-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-07-13 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 249 - 176 (Roll no. 441). (text: CR H4860) |
2016-07-13 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2016-07-13 | House | DEBATE - The House continued debate on H.R. 5119. |
2016-07-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 5119. |
2016-07-13 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4992, H.R. 5119 and H.R. 5631 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. |
2016-07-13 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 819. (consideration: CR H4860-4866) |
2016-07-11 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 819 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4992, H.R. 5119 and H.R. 5631 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. |
2016-04-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2016-04-28 | House | Introduced in House |