US HB4957 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-31 - Became Public Law No: 111-153.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-31 - Became Public Law No: 111-153.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Federal Aviation Administration Extension Act of 2010 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to extend through April 30, 2010: (1) excise taxes on aviation fuels and air transportation of persons and property; and (2) the expenditure authority for the Airport and Airway Trust Fund. Authorizes appropriations for the seven-month period from October 1, 2009, through April 30, 2010, for airport improvement program (AIP) projects, including project grant authority. Sets forth a formula for calculating the apportionment of AIP funding. Extends through April 30, 2010, various airport development projects, including: (1) the pilot program for passenger facility fees at nonhub airports; (2) small airport grants for airports located in the Marshall Islands, Micronesia, and Palau; (3) the temporary increase to 95% in the government share of certain AIP project costs; and (4) the funding of Midway Island airport development. Extends through April 30, 2010: (1) state and local land use compatibility projects under the AIP program; (2) the authority of the Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority to apply for an airport development grant and impose a passenger facility fee; (3) Department of Transportation (DOT) insurance coverage for domestic and foreign-flag air carriers, allowing further extension through July 31, 2010; and (4) certain competitive access assurance requirements for large or medium hub airport sponsors applying for AIP grants. Extends through July 31, 2010, air carrier liability limits for injuries to passengers resulting from acts of terrorism. Extends for the seven-month period from October 1, 2009, through April 30, 2010, the authorization of appropriations for: (1) Federal Aviation Administration (FAA) operations; (2) air navigation facilities and equipment; and (3) research, engineering, and development.
Title
Federal Aviation Administration Extension Act of 2010
Sponsors
Rep. Laura Richardson [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-31 | Became Public Law No: 111-153. | |
2010-03-31 | Signed by President. | |
2010-03-26 | Presented to President. | |
2010-03-26 | Cleared for White House. | |
2010-03-26 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | |
2010-03-26 | Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2151) | |
2010-03-25 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-03-25 | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H2450-2451) | |
2010-03-25 | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H2450-2451) | |
2010-03-25 | Committee on Ways and Means discharged. | |
2010-03-25 | Committee on Transportation discharged. | |
2010-03-25 | Ms. Richardson asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. | |
2010-03-25 | Referred to House Ways and Means | |
2010-03-25 | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure | |
2010-03-25 | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1512 (Related) 2009-03-30 - Became Public Law No: 111-12.
HB3607 (Related) 2009-10-01 - Became Public Law No: 111-69.
HB4217 (Related) 2009-12-16 - Became Public Law No: 111-116.
HB4853 (Related) 2010-12-17 - Became Public Law No: 111-312.
HB4915 (Related) 2010-12-20 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HB5147 (Related) 2010-04-30 - Became Public Law No: 111-161.
SB3187 (Same As) 2010-09-23 - Message received in the Senate: Returned to the Senate pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 1653.
HB5611 (Same As) 2010-07-02 - Became Public Law No: 111-197.
HB5900 (Related) 2010-08-01 - Became Public Law No: 111-216.
HB6190 (Related) 2010-09-30 - Became Public Law No: 111-249.
HB6473 (Related) 2010-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 111-329.
HB3607 (Related) 2009-10-01 - Became Public Law No: 111-69.
HB4217 (Related) 2009-12-16 - Became Public Law No: 111-116.
HB4853 (Related) 2010-12-17 - Became Public Law No: 111-312.
HB4915 (Related) 2010-12-20 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HB5147 (Related) 2010-04-30 - Became Public Law No: 111-161.
SB3187 (Same As) 2010-09-23 - Message received in the Senate: Returned to the Senate pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 1653.
HB5611 (Same As) 2010-07-02 - Became Public Law No: 111-197.
HB5900 (Related) 2010-08-01 - Became Public Law No: 111-216.
HB6190 (Related) 2010-09-30 - Became Public Law No: 111-249.
HB6473 (Related) 2010-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 111-329.
Subjects
Aviation and airports
Civil actions and liability
Department of Transportation
District of Columbia
Executive agency funding and structure
Foreign aid and international relief
Government trust funds
Land use and conservation
Marshall Islands
Maryland
Micronesia
Motor fuels
Oceania
Palau
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Sales and excise taxes
Terrorism
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
U.S. territories and protectorates
User charges and fees
Virginia
Civil actions and liability
Department of Transportation
District of Columbia
Executive agency funding and structure
Foreign aid and international relief
Government trust funds
Land use and conservation
Marshall Islands
Maryland
Micronesia
Motor fuels
Oceania
Palau
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Sales and excise taxes
Terrorism
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
U.S. territories and protectorates
User charges and fees
Virginia