US HB6190 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Became Public Law No: 111-249.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Airport and Airway Extension Act of 2010, Part III - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to extend through December 31, 2010: (1) increased excise taxes on aviation fuels and the excise tax on air transportation of persons and property; and (2) the expenditure authority for the Airport and Airway Trust Fund. Makes funds available for the three-month period beginning on October 1, 2010, for airport planning and development and noise compatibility planning projects. Extends through December 31, 2010, the authority of the Secretary of Transportation to make airport improvement project (AIP) grants. Extends through December 31, 2010: (1) the pilot programs for passenger facility fee authorizations at non-hub airports; and (2) disclosure requirements for large and medium hub airports applying for AIP grants. Extends through FY2011 the authorization of appropriations for the program of assistance to small communities with insufficient air carrier service. Directs the Secretary to extend through December 31, 2010, the termination date of insurance coverage for domestic or foreign-flag aircraft. Grants the Secretary discretionary authority to further extend such coverage through March 31, 2011. Extends through March 31, 2011, the authority of the Secretary to limit air carrier liability for claims arising out of acts of terrorism. Extends through December 31, 2010: (1) grant eligibility for airports located in the Marshall Islands, Micronesia, and Palau; (2) grants to state and local governments for land use compatibility projects under an AIP; and (3) authority for approving an application of the Metropolitan Washington Airport Authority for an airport development project grant or for permission to impose a passenger facility fee. Amends the Vision 100--Century of Aviation Reauthorization Act to extend through December 31, 2010: (1) the temporary increase to 95% of the federal government's share of certain AIP project costs; and (2) funding for airport development at Midway Island Airport. Extends through FY2011 the termination date for final orders issued by the Secretary with respect to the eligibility of a small community for essential air service compensation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Airport and Airway Extension Act of 2010, Part III

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-09-30 Became Public Law No: 111-249.
2010-09-30 Signed by President.
2010-09-28 Presented to President.
2010-09-24 Cleared for White House.
2010-09-24 Message on Senate action sent to the House.
2010-09-24 Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7454)
2010-09-23 Received in the Senate, read twice.
2010-09-23 Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2010-09-23 On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6943)
2010-09-23 DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6190.
2010-09-23 Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6943-6945)
2010-09-23 Mr. Lewis (GA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2010-09-23 Referred to House Ways and Means
2010-09-23 Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
2010-09-23 Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.

Same As/Similar To

HB1512 (Related) 2009-03-30 - Became Public Law No: 111-12.
HB3607 (Related) 2009-10-01 - Became Public Law No: 111-69.
HB4217 (Related) 2009-12-16 - Became Public Law No: 111-116.
HB4853 (Related) 2010-12-17 - Became Public Law No: 111-312.
HB4915 (Related) 2010-12-20 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HB4957 (Related) 2010-03-31 - Became Public Law No: 111-153.
HB5147 (Related) 2010-04-30 - Became Public Law No: 111-161.
HB5611 (Related) 2010-07-02 - Became Public Law No: 111-197.
HB5900 (Related) 2010-08-01 - Became Public Law No: 111-216.
SB3187 (Related) 2010-09-23 - Message received in the Senate: Returned to the Senate pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 1653.
HB6473 (Related) 2010-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 111-329.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback