US HB6473 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on December 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 111-329.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on December 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 111-329.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Airport and Airway Extension Act of 2010, Part IV - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to extend through March 31, 2011: (1) increased excise taxes on aviation fuels and the excise tax on air transportation of persons and property; and (2) the expenditure authority for the Airport and Airway Trust Fund. Makes funds available for the six-month period beginning on October 1, 2010, for airport planning and development and noise compatibility planning projects. Prescribes a formula for calculating funding apportionments and meeting certain other requirements for the six-month period, including a 50% reduction in these apportionments and specified other amounts. Extends through March 31, 2011, the authority of the Secretary of Transportation to make airport improvement project (AIP) grants. Extends through March 31, 2011: (1) the pilot programs for passenger facility fee authorizations at non-hub airports; and (2) disclosure requirements for large and medium hub airports applying for AIP grants. Directs the Secretary to extend through March 31, 2011, the termination date of insurance coverage for domestic or foreign-flag aircraft. Grants the Secretary discretionary authority to further extend such coverage through June 30, 2011. Extends through June 30, 2011, the authority of the Secretary to limit air carrier liability for claims arising out of acts of terrorism. Extends through March 31, 2011: (1) grant eligibility for airports located in the Marshall Islands, Micronesia, and Palau; (2) grants to state and local governments for land use compatibility projects under an AIP; and (3) authority for approving an application of the Metropolitan Washington Airport Authority for an airport development project grant or for permission to impose a passenger facility fee. Amends the Vision 100--Century of Aviation Reauthorization Act to extend through March 31, 2011: (1) the temporary increase to 95% of the federal government's share of certain AIP project costs; and (2) funding for airport development at Midway Island Airport.
Title
Airport and Airway Extension Act of 2010, Part IV
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Costello [D-IL] | Rep. Sander Levin [D-MI] | Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] | Rep. John Mica [R-FL] |
Rep. James Oberstar [D-MN] | Rep. Thomas Petri [R-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-22 | Became Public Law No: 111-329. | |
2010-12-22 | Signed by President. | |
2010-12-21 | Presented to President. | |
2010-12-20 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | |
2010-12-18 | Cleared for White House. | |
2010-12-18 | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S10696) | |
2010-12-02 | Received in the Senate, read twice. | |
2010-12-02 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-12-02 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7867) | |
2010-12-02 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6473. | |
2010-12-02 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7867-7869) | |
2010-12-02 | Mr. Costello moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. | |
2010-12-02 | Referred to House Ways and Means | |
2010-12-02 | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure | |
2010-12-02 | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3607 (Related) 2009-10-01 - Became Public Law No: 111-69.
HB4217 (Related) 2009-12-16 - Became Public Law No: 111-116.
HB4853 (Related) 2010-12-17 - Became Public Law No: 111-312.
HB4915 (Related) 2010-12-20 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HB4957 (Related) 2010-03-31 - Became Public Law No: 111-153.
HB5147 (Related) 2010-04-30 - Became Public Law No: 111-161.
HB5611 (Related) 2010-07-02 - Became Public Law No: 111-197.
HB5900 (Related) 2010-08-01 - Became Public Law No: 111-216.
HB6190 (Related) 2010-09-30 - Became Public Law No: 111-249.
SB3187 (Related) 2010-09-23 - Message received in the Senate: Returned to the Senate pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 1653.
HB4217 (Related) 2009-12-16 - Became Public Law No: 111-116.
HB4853 (Related) 2010-12-17 - Became Public Law No: 111-312.
HB4915 (Related) 2010-12-20 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HB4957 (Related) 2010-03-31 - Became Public Law No: 111-153.
HB5147 (Related) 2010-04-30 - Became Public Law No: 111-161.
HB5611 (Related) 2010-07-02 - Became Public Law No: 111-197.
HB5900 (Related) 2010-08-01 - Became Public Law No: 111-216.
HB6190 (Related) 2010-09-30 - Became Public Law No: 111-249.
SB3187 (Related) 2010-09-23 - Message received in the Senate: Returned to the Senate pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 1653.
Subjects
Aviation and airports
Civil actions and liability
District of Columbia
Foreign aid and international relief
Government trust funds
Intergovernmental relations
Land use and conservation
Life, casualty, property insurance
Marshall Islands
Maryland
Micronesia
Motor fuels
Noise pollution
Oceania
Palau
Sales and excise taxes
State and local finance
Terrorism
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
U.S. territories and protectorates
User charges and fees
Virginia
Civil actions and liability
District of Columbia
Foreign aid and international relief
Government trust funds
Intergovernmental relations
Land use and conservation
Life, casualty, property insurance
Marshall Islands
Maryland
Micronesia
Motor fuels
Noise pollution
Oceania
Palau
Sales and excise taxes
State and local finance
Terrorism
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
U.S. territories and protectorates
User charges and fees
Virginia