US HB4702 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-0)
Status: Introduced on July 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Servicemembers Civil Relief Act to provide spouses of servicemembers an option to elect their home residence or domicile for filing State income taxes, and for other purposes.
Title
Military Spouse Tax Act
Sponsors
Rep. David Cawthorn [R-NC] | Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] | Rep. Tracey Mann [R-KS] | Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA] |
Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] | Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] | Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] | Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] |
Rep. John Carter [R-TX] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. Maria Salazar [R-FL] | Rep. Ashley Hinson [R-IA] |
Rep. Scott DesJarlais [R-TN] | Rep. Scott Franklin [R-FL] | Rep. Lisa McClain [R-MI] | Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] |
Rep. Barry Moore [R-AL] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] |
Rep. Mike Johnson [R-LA] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA] |
Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] | Rep. Ken Buck [R-CO] | Rep. Yvette Herrell [R-NM] | Rep. Mark Green [R-TN] |
Rep. Greg Murphy [R-NC] | Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] | Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA] | Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-18 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-09-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2021-07-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-07-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB7939 (Related) 2023-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 117-333.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/4702/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr4702/BILLS-117hr4702ih.pdf |