US HB4675 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Introduced on July 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to exclude from gross income amounts received from State-based catastrophe loss mitigation programs.
Title
Disaster Mitigation and Tax Parity Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] |
Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC] | Rep. Tom Rice [R-SC] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] |
Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] | Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] | Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA] |
Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Scott Fitzgerald [R-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2021-07-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3954 (Related) 2021-07-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on General Farm Commodities and Risk Management.
SB2432 (Same As) 2022-09-08 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
HB5376 (Related) 2022-08-16 - Became Public Law No: 117-169.
SB5176 (Related) 2022-12-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2432 (Same As) 2022-09-08 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
HB5376 (Related) 2022-08-16 - Became Public Law No: 117-169.
SB5176 (Related) 2022-12-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/4675/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr4675/BILLS-117hr4675ih.pdf |