US HB3954 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on General Farm Commodities and Risk Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on General Farm Commodities and Risk Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on General Farm Commodities and Risk Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on General Farm Commodities and Risk Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to provide disaster tax relief, exclude from gross income amounts received from State-based catastrophe loss mitigation programs, and for other purposes.
Title
Disaster Tax Relief Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on General Farm Commodities and Risk Management. |
2021-06-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Small Business, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-06-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4675 (Related) 2021-07-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB2432 (Related) 2022-09-08 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
SB2432 (Related) 2022-09-08 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/3954/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr3954/BILLS-117hr3954ih.pdf |