US HB4646 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-214. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-214. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1900 Corporate Drive in Birmingham, Alabama, as the "Lance Corporal Thomas E. Rivers, Jr. Post Office Building". (Sec. 1) Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1900 Corporate Drive in Birmingham, Alabama, as the "Lance Corporal Thomas E. Rivers, Jr. Post Office Building."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1900 Corporate Drive in Birmingham, Alabama, as the "Lance Corporal Thomas E. Rivers, Jr. Post Office Building".
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Palmer [R-AL] | Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL] | Rep. Martha Roby [R-AL] | Rep. Mike D. Rogers [R-AL] |
Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL] | Rep. Robert Aderholt [R-AL] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-24 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-214. (TXT | PDF) |
2018-07-24 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-07-12 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4808) |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 462. |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-03-05 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-03-05 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1349) |
2018-03-05 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4646. |
2018-03-05 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1349-1350) |
2018-03-05 | House | Mr. Palmer moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-02-06 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-02-06 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-12-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2017-12-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Alabama
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
Postal service
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
Postal service