US HB4498 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Helping Angels Lead Our Startups Act or the HALOS Act (Sec. 3) This bill directs the Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC) to amend Regulation D (governing the limited offer and sale of securities without registration under the Securities Act of 1933) to make the prohibition against general solicitation or general advertising inapplicable to events with specified kinds of sponsors (including angel investor groups not connected to broker-dealers or investment advisers) where: presentations or communications are made by or on behalf of an issuer, the advertising does not refer to any specific offering of securities by the issuer, the sponsor does not engage in certain activities (such as offering investment recommendations or advice to attendees), the sponsor does not receive compensation for the event which would require registration as a broker or dealer or as an investment advisor, and no specific information regarding a securities offering is communicated (other than that the issuer is in the process of offering or planning to offer securities, including the type and amount of securities being offered). This bill may only be construed as requiring the SEC to amend Regulation D with respect to presentations and communications, and not with respect to purchases or sales.
Title
Helping Angels Lead Our Startups Act or the HALOS Act
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Rep. Robert Hurt [R-VA] | Rep. Mark Takai [D-HI] |
Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R-FL] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Ryan Costello [R-PA] | Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] |
Rep. Randy Hultgren [R-IL] | Rep. John Delaney [D-MD] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] | Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-27 - House - On Passage (Y: 325 N: 89 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - House - On Agreeing to the Amendment (Y: 139 N: 272 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-27 - House - On Agreeing to the Amendment (Y: 139 N: 272 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2016-04-27 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-04-27 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 325 - 89 (Roll no. 171). (text: CR H2037-2038) |
2016-04-27 | House | H.Amdt.982 On agreeing to the Waters, Maxine amendment (A001) Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 139 - 272 (Roll no. 170). |
2016-04-27 | House | H.Amdt.982 The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A001) pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H2045) |
2016-04-27 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 701, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Waters amendment. |
2016-04-27 | House | H.Amdt.982 Amendment (A001) offered by Ms. Waters, Maxine. (consideration: CR H2044-2045; text: CR H2044) |
2016-04-27 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 4498. |
2016-04-27 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4498 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. A specified amendment is in order. |
2016-04-27 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 701. (consideration: CR H2037-2046) |
2016-04-27 | House | Rule H. Res. 701 passed House. |
2016-04-26 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 701 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4498 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. A specified amendment is in order. |
2016-04-19 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 389. |
2016-04-19 | House | Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 114-509. |
2016-03-02 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 44 - 13. |
2016-03-02 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-02-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2016-02-09 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-12-02 | House | Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises Prior to Introduction and Referral. |
Same As/Similar To
SB978 (Related) 2015-04-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HR701 (Related) 2016-04-27 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR701 (Related) 2016-04-27 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Business investment and capital
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Higher education
Marketing and advertising
Securities
Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC)
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Business investment and capital
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Higher education
Marketing and advertising
Securities
Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC)
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations